Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101582

EP1101582 - Portable woodworking power tool with depth stop [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.04.2001
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Welsh, Robert E.
913 Farmstead Road
Hunt Valley, Maryland 21030 / US
02 / Gehret, Robert S.
3670 Mandolin Drive
Hampstead, Maryland 21074 / US
03 / O'Banion, Michael L.
1230 Canon Way
Westminster, Maryland 21157 / US
04 / Boyd, P Brent
133 Hershey Circle
Stewartstown, Pennsylvania 17363 / US
05 / Wixley, Barry D.
1653 Chaff Drive
Finksburg, Maryland 21048 / US
06 / Shadeck, Louis M.
9 Glenamoy Court
Timonium, Maryland 21093 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe
European Group Headquarters
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker Europe European Group Headquarters 210 Bath Road Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Former [2001/21]Dlugosz, Anthony Charles , et al
Black & Decker, 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Application number, filing date01100306.829.07.1996
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateUS19950002433P27.07.1995         Original published format: US 2433 P
US1996065968405.06.1996         Original published format: US 659684
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101582
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1101582
Date:10.12.2003
[2003/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:B27C1/04, B27C1/14, B23Q16/00, B23Q17/22
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/21]
TitleGerman:Tragbare Werkzeugmaschine mit Tiefenanschlag zum Bearbeiten von Holz[2001/21]
English:Portable woodworking power tool with depth stop[2001/21]
French:Outil portatif motorisé pour travailler le bois avec une butée de profondeur[2001/21]
Examination procedure04.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
09.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96305549.6  / EP0755759
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200308   M06   Not yet paid
31.07.200409   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4436462  (MARTINEZ RAFAEL [US]) [X] 1-5 * figure - *;
 [A]US3718168  (BERENDS E) [A] 1 * the whole document *