Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1117226

EP1117226 - Connection setting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2007
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 23.01.2008  [2008/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
[2007/27]
Former [2006/40]For all designated states
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
Former [2001/29]For all designated states
YAMAHA CORPORATION
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujimori, Junichi, c/o Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
02 / Kuribayashi, Hirotaka, c/o Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
03 / Nakamura, Yoshinari, c/o Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
04 / Abe, Tatsutoshi, c/o Yamaha Corporation
10-1, Nakazawa-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP
 [2001/29]
Representative(s)Kehl, Günther
Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr
Patentanwälte
Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/29]Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date01100895.016.01.2001
[2001/29]
Priority number, dateJP2000001031417.01.2000         Original published format: JP 2000010314
[2001/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1117226
Date:18.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1117226
Date:11.06.2003
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1117226
Date:04.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, G10H1/00, H04L12/28, G06F13/42, H04H7/00
[2003/23]
Former International [2001/29]H04L29/06, G10H1/00, H04L12/28, G06F13/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2004/10]
Former [2001/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verbindungsherstellungsvorrichtung[2001/29]
English:Connection setting apparatus[2001/29]
French:Dispositif d'établissement de connection[2001/29]
Examination procedure16.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
01.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2006Fee for grant paid
10.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2008/04]
Former [2007/36]IT04.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9959309  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8,11,12 * page 7, lines 4-16 * * page 10, lines 12-24 * * page 12, line 14 - page 15, line 12 * * page 16, line 17 - page 17, line 17 * * page 19, lines 10-18 *;
 [X]WO9906910  (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11,12 * page 12, line 22 - page 15, line 19 *;
 [XA]US5471539  (FLUM ALAN [US], et al) [X] 10 * column 1, lines 62-66 * * column 3, lines 33-42 * [A] 9,13
 [A]  WICKELGREN I J, "THE FACTS ABOUT FIREWIRE", IEEE SPECTRUM, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19970401), vol. 34, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9235, pages 19 - 25, XP002051393 [A] 1-13 * paragraph "Musical Links"; page 25 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/6.583441