Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1100274 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1100274



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 512
14.05.1998 Priority document Search / examination 36
14.05.1998 Priority document Search / examination 50
10.08.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 51
10.08.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 76
30.01.2001 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
30.01.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.01.2001 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
30.01.2001 Drawings Search / examination 22
30.01.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2001 Description Search / examination 73
30.01.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
30.01.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.02.2001 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
29.03.2001 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
04.04.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.04.2001 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
18.04.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
18.04.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.04.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
31.05.2001 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
06.06.2001 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.07.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.11.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
03.12.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.12.2001 Description Search / examination 1
03.12.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
10.12.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 Means of redress Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 3
15.02.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
15.02.2002 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
20.02.2002 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.04.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.04.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.06.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
13.06.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
11.07.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
12.07.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
13.05.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 10
02.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
30.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
04.10.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.10.2004 Description Search / examination 9
04.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
10.01.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 93
10.01.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
10.01.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
31.03.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
31.03.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
31.03.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.03.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.02.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.10.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
15.12.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1