blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1100274 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1100274



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 512
15.12.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
14.10.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
16.02.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.03.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.03.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.03.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
31.03.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
10.01.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 93
04.10.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
04.10.2004 Description Search / examination 9
04.10.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
02.06.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.05.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 10
12.07.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
11.07.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
13.06.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
10.06.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
18.04.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.04.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.02.2002 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
15.02.2002 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
15.02.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 3
15.02.2002 Means of redress Search / examination 1
10.12.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.12.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
03.12.2001 Description Search / examination 1
03.12.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.11.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
26.07.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.07.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.06.2001 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
31.05.2001 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
18.04.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
18.04.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.04.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
09.04.2001 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
04.04.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
29.03.2001 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
06.02.2001 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
30.01.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.01.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
30.01.2001 Description Search / examination 73
30.01.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2001 Drawings Search / examination 22
30.01.2001 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
30.01.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.01.2001 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
10.08.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 51
10.08.1998 Translation of priority document Search / examination 76
14.05.1998 Priority document Search / examination 36
14.05.1998 Priority document Search / examination 50