blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1100274 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP01101679 EP01101680 EP01101681 EP01101682 EP01104566 EP05006668 EP97911464



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7522775Global Dossier 21.04.2009B2
US2008118168 22.05.2008A1
Priority number Date
US756308 11.01.2008
US90683301 18.07.2001
US39282703 21.03.2003
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US9198598 11.08.1998
US48382106 11.07.2006
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7505631Global Dossier 17.03.2009B2
US2008118167 22.05.2008A1
Priority number Date
US756208 11.01.2008
US90683301 18.07.2001
US39282703 21.03.2003
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US9198598 11.08.1998
US48382106 11.07.2006
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7379606Global Dossier 27.05.2008B2
US2006251333 09.11.2006A1
Priority number Date
US39282703 21.03.2003
US90683301 18.07.2001
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US48382106 11.07.2006
US9198598 11.08.1998
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7289670Global Dossier 30.10.2007B2
US2006251332 09.11.2006A1
Priority number Date
US39282703 21.03.2003
US90683301 18.07.2001
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US9198598 11.08.1998
US48382006 11.07.2006
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7116829Global Dossier 03.10.2006B1
Priority number Date
US39282703 21.03.2003
US90683301 18.07.2001
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US9198598 11.08.1998
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2005065314Global Dossier 10.03.2005A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP2004270361 16.09.2004
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2005065311Global Dossier 10.03.2005A
Priority number Date
JP2004270355 16.09.2004
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001309376Global Dossier 02.11.2001A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP2001052835 27.02.2001
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001094993Global Dossier 06.04.2001A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP2000230559 31.07.2000
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3776921BGlobal Dossier 24.05.2006B2
JP2005057796 03.03.2005A
Priority number Date
JP2004270357 16.09.2004
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3776920BGlobal Dossier 24.05.2006B2
JP2005065312 10.03.2005A
Priority number Date
JP2004270356 16.09.2004
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3743962BGlobal Dossier 08.02.2006B2
JP2005065313 10.03.2005A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP2004270360 16.09.2004
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3743961BGlobal Dossier 08.02.2006B2
JP2005039855 10.02.2005A
Priority number Date
JP2004270359 16.09.2004
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3743960BGlobal Dossier 08.02.2006B2
JP2005039854 10.02.2005A
Priority number Date
JP2004270358 16.09.2004
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3380810BGlobal Dossier 24.02.2003B2
JP2003018601 17.01.2003A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
JP2002092211 28.03.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3103383BGlobal Dossier 30.10.2000B2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP9704037 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1560439Global Dossier 12.08.2009B1
EP1560439 24.08.2005A3
EP1560439 03.08.2005A2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
EP01101681 06.11.1997
EP97911464 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1104972Global Dossier 10.09.2003B1
EP1104972 06.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
EP97911464 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1100275Global Dossier 02.04.2003B1
EP1100275 30.05.2001A3
EP1100275 16.05.2001A2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
EP97911464 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1100273Global Dossier 12.04.2006B1
EP1100273 30.05.2001A3
EP1100273 16.05.2001A2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
EP97911464 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1100272Global Dossier 02.04.2003B1
EP1100272 30.05.2001A3
EP1100272 16.05.2001A2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
EP97911464 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0873018Global Dossier 25.09.2002B1
EP0873018 17.01.2001A4
EP0873018 21.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP9704037 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1100274Global Dossier 12.04.2006B1
EP1100274 30.05.2001A3
EP1100274 16.05.2001A2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
EP97911464 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69715815D 31.10.2002D1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP9704037 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69715815T 22.05.2003T2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP9704037 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6345123 05.02.2002B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP9704037 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6411739 25.06.2002B2
US2001001018 10.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US68432200 10.10.2000
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US9198598 11.08.1998
US73996900 20.12.2000
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6445827 03.09.2002B2
US2001001017 10.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US68432200 10.10.2000
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US9198598 11.08.1998
US73996800 20.12.2000
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6556717 29.04.2003B2
US2001046329 29.11.2001A1
Priority number Date
US90683401 18.07.2001
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US9198598 11.08.1998
JP9704037 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6574369 03.06.2003B2
US2001046325 29.11.2001A1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US9198598 11.08.1998
JP9704037 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6608936 19.08.2003B2
US2001046328 29.11.2001A1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US9198598 11.08.1998
JP9704037 06.11.1997
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6650785 18.11.2003B2
US2002003907 10.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US68432200 10.10.2000
JP29351296 06.11.1996
US73988300 20.12.2000
US9198598 11.08.1998
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9820681Global Dossier 14.05.1998A1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100469176BGlobal Dossier 02.02.2005B1
KR20030097615 31.12.2003A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100402541BGlobal Dossier 22.10.2003B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100318058BGlobal Dossier 24.12.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100318057BGlobal Dossier 24.12.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100318056BGlobal Dossier 24.12.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100318055BGlobal Dossier 24.12.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3135062BGlobal Dossier 13.02.2001B2
JP2000316154 14.11.2000A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3135061BGlobal Dossier 13.02.2001B2
JP2000316153 14.11.2000A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1136733C 28.01.2004C
CN1210651 10.03.1999A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1173579C 27.10.2004C
CN1362836 07.08.2002A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1173580C 27.10.2004C
CN1362837 07.08.2002A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1173581C 27.10.2004C
CN1362838 07.08.2002A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1177488C 24.11.2004C
CN1362835 07.08.2002A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1201595C 11.05.2005C
CN1374808 16.10.2002A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100393138C 04.06.2008C
CN1681327 12.10.2005A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69720558D 08.05.2003D1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69720558T 04.03.2004T2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69720559D 08.05.2003D1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69720559T 12.02.2004T2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69724841D 16.10.2003D1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69724841T 08.07.2004T2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69735679D 24.05.2006D1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69735679T 23.11.2006T2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69735680D 24.05.2006D1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69735680T 23.11.2006T2
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69739536D 24.09.2009D1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR19990077060 25.10.1999A
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG102016 27.02.2004A1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW366670B 11.08.1999B
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6278801 21.08.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6349149 19.02.2002B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6404929 11.06.2002B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6490372 03.12.2002B1
Priority number Date
JP29351296 06.11.1996
JP6264997 17.03.1997
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1560439
TypeType Earlier application
 EP0873018