blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1100274

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 NL 
Examination procedure04.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
24.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
17.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
European patent granted12.04.2006
Appeal following examination16.04.2002APPEAL FILED
10.06.2002APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
28.04.2004APPEAL RESULT
Opposition procedure15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit published on 21.03.2007 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.05.2001 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:873018
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:16.05.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:16.05.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010216
 
Event date:30.05.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:12.09.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010726
 
Event date:20.02.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:12.04.2006 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:0873018
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:12.04.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:12.04.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:24.05.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69735680
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20060524
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:24.11.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:21.03.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20070115
 
Event date:09.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140612 AND 20140618
 
Event date:11.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69735680 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE
 
Event date:21.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69735680 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE
Effective DATE:20140711
 
Event date:21.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 69735680 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION OF, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: PANASONIC CORPORATION, KADOMA-SHI, OSAKA, JP
Effective DATE:20140711
 
Event date:22.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION OF, US
Effective DATE:20140722
 
Event date:12.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL TD
Code Expl.: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS
Effective DATE:20141103
 
Event date:12.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SD
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS
Effective DATE:20141103
 
Event date:08.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:14.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20161014
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20161102
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20161010
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20161101
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:06.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69735680 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:08.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20171105
 
Event date:29.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20171105
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20171105