Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100274

EP1100274 - Image decoding method using variable length codes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Boon, Chong Seng
Room 416, Shatomorioka, 2-5, Toudacho 4-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0014 / JP
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25
1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH
Former [2001/20]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novapat International SA, 9, rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date01101681.306.11.1997
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateJP1996029351206.11.1996         Original published format: JP 29351296
JP1997006264917.03.1997         Original published format: JP 6264997
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1100274
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1100274
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100274
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/50, H03M7/42, H04N7/30
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/20]
TitleGerman:Methode zur Bilddekodierung mit Kodes variabler Länge[2001/20]
English:Image decoding method using variable length codes[2001/20]
French:Procédé de décodage d'image utilisant des codes de longueur variable[2005/03]
Former [2001/20]Procédé de décodage d'image utilisant des codes de longuer variable
Examination procedure30.01.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
16.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
26.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
29.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
02.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2005Fee for grant paid
04.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination16.04.2002Appeal received No.  T0636/02
10.06.2002Statement of grounds filed
28.04.2004Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97911464.2  / EP0873018
Divisional application(s)EP05006668.7  / EP1560439
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
24.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
17.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0595242  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5384644  (YAMAGAMI TAKU [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5400075  (SAVATIER TRISTAN [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]US4939583  (TSUBOI YUKITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *