Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1152041

EP1152041 - Coating system for the preparation of aqueous coating compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 03.08.2011  [2011/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/44]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Former [2004/36]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US
Former [2001/45]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wandelmaier, Klaus
Triebelsheide 25
42111 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Wiggershaus, Stefan
Grobe Heide 15
58332 Schwelm / DE
 [2001/45]
Representative(s)Dannenberger, Oliver Andre , et al
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/12]Dannenberger, Oliver Andre , et al
Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
Former [2007/23]Heinemann, Monica , et al
Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
Former [2002/22]DuPont Performance Coatings, Christine Biering/Christine Kimpel
Patent and License Department, Christbusch 25
42285 Wuppertal / DE
Former [2001/45]Kimpel, Christine, Dr. , et al
DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co. KG Christbusch 25
42285 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date01102090.631.01.2001
[2001/45]
Priority number, dateUS2000056075128.04.2000         Original published format: US 560751
[2001/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1152041
Date:07.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1152041
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1152041
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/02, C09D7/14
[2001/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/30]
Former [2001/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Beschichtungssystem zur Herstellung von wässrigen Beschichtungszusammensetzungen[2001/45]
English:Coating system for the preparation of aqueous coating compositions[2001/45]
French:SystÌme de rev?tement pour la pr?paration de compositions aqueuses de rev?tements[2007/31]
Former [2001/45]Sytème de revêtement pour la préparation de compositions aqueuses de revêtements
Examination procedure21.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/04]
12.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2004Fee for grant paid
16.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Quelle-Fontijn, Monique
Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department (DEPT.AIP) P.O. Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 02  30.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings GmbH
CT/R-B311
Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Burgplatz 21-22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/23]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Quelle-Fontijn, Monique
Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department (DEPT.AIP) P.O. Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 02  30.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings GmbH
CT/R-B311 Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Leifert & Steffan
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09
40031 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/40]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Quelle-Fontijn, Monique
Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department (DEPT.AIP) P.O. Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 02  30.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings AG
CT/R-B311 Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Leifert & Steffan
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09
40031 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2007/23]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Quelle-Fontijn, Monique
Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department (DEPT.AIP) P.O. Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 02  30.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings AG
CT/R-B311 Glasuritstr. 1
48165 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Leifert & Steffan
Patentanwälte Burgplatz 21-22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2006/45]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Quelle-Fontijn, Monique
Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department (DEPT.AIP) P.O. Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 02  30.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings AG
CT/R-B311 Glasuritstr. 1
48165 Münster / DE
Former [2005/30]
Opponent(s)01  27.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Quelle-Fontijn, Monique
Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department (DEPT.AIP) P.O. Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 02  30.05.2005  08.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings AG
Glasuritstr. 1
48165 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Münch, Volker
Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
07.07.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.11.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.06.2007Date of oral proceedings
10.07.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.07.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.03.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.08.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
21.09.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition07.09.2007Appeal received No.  T1499/07
14.11.2007Statement of grounds filed
15.03.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
07.09.2007Appeal received No.  T1499/07
13.11.2007Statement of grounds filed
15.03.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
15.03.2010Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
CY31.01.2005
IE31.01.2005
LU31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
SE01.02.2009
DK31.07.2009
[2011/31]
Former [2010/35]FI01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
CY31.01.2005
IE31.01.2005
LU31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
DK31.07.2009
Former [2008/21]FI01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
CY31.01.2005
IE31.01.2005
LU31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2007/20]FI01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
DE02.12.2004
CY31.01.2005
IE31.01.2005
LU31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2007/09]FI01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
DE02.12.2004
IE31.01.2005
LU31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/51]FI01.09.2004
TR01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
DE02.12.2004
IE31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/23]FI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
DE02.12.2004
IE31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/14]FI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
DE02.12.2004
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/03]FI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
DE02.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI01.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4415292  (HERBERTS GMBH) [A] 1,7,9-11 * page 3, lines 5-65 * * page 6, lines 18-46 * * page 7, lines 27-65 * * page 7, line 67 - page 8, line 53 * * page 9, line 54 - page 10, line 9 *;
 [A]DE19714577  (BASF COATINGS AG) [A] 1 * claims 1-14 *;
 [AD]DE4301991  (HERBERTS GMBH);
 [A]EP0752455  (BASF LACKE & FARBEN);
 [AD]EP0578645  (BASF LACKE + FARBEN AG)
OppositionDE4415292
 DE19714557