Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1152041 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1152041



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 782
10.04.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
07.10.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.10.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.10.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
21.09.2010 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
21.09.2010 French translation of claims Opposition 2
21.09.2010 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
21.09.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
09.08.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
09.08.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
09.08.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
09.08.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
02.08.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
07.07.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
10.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
10.05.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
10.05.2010 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
06.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.05.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
03.05.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.04.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 19
28.04.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 9
28.04.2010 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
22.03.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 15
17.02.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
17.02.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
16.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.02.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
13.02.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
12.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.02.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
11.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.12.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
17.12.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.12.2009 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.06.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
30.05.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
30.05.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 2
10.04.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
01.04.2008 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
03.01.2008 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.11.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
16.11.2007 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 18
16.11.2007 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
16.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
14.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 35
13.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
19.10.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.10.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.09.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.09.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
11.09.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.09.2007 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
10.09.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.09.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
07.09.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 8
07.09.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
07.09.2007 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
20.07.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.07.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
10.07.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.07.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
10.07.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.07.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.05.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.05.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
07.05.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2007 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
27.04.2007 Claims Opposition 2
27.04.2007 Claims Opposition 2
27.04.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.04.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
26.04.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
24.04.2007 Request for change of representative Opposition 2
05.07.2006 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
05.07.2006 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
04.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.06.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.06.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.06.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.06.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.06.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.11.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2005 Claims Opposition 2
03.11.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
07.07.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.07.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.07.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.06.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.06.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
31.05.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 6
31.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
31.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
31.05.2005 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
30.05.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 15
30.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
30.05.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
30.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
30.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
30.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 70
30.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.05.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
27.05.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 7
22.07.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.04.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
16.04.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.03.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.03.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.03.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
05.11.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.04.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.03.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.11.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.09.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
31.08.2001 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
06.08.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.08.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.08.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
19.06.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.05.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
28.05.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
28.02.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
28.02.2001 Priority document Search / examination 23
13.02.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.02.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
13.02.2001 Description Search / examination 17
13.02.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.01.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.01.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
31.01.2001 Description Search / examination 17
31.01.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.01.2001 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.01.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6