Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1130577

EP1130577 - Method for the reconstruction of low speech frequencies from mid-range frequencies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.04.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schultz, Jürgen
Stettiner Strasse 4
38554 Weyhausen / DE
02 / Schaaf, Klaus, Dr.
Dorothea-Erxleben-Strasse 29
38116 Braunschweig / DE
 [2001/36]
Application number, filing date01102129.201.02.2001
[2001/36]
Priority number, dateDE200011003702.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10010037
[2001/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1130577
Date:05.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1130577
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1130577
Date:06.06.2007
Language:DE
[2007/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G10L21/02
[2001/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/36]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Rekonstruktion tieffrequenter Sprachanteile aus mittelhohen Frequenzanteilen[2001/36]
English:Method for the reconstruction of low speech frequencies from mid-range frequencies[2001/36]
French:Procédé de reconstruction des basses fréquences du signal de parole à partir de fréquences moyennes[2001/36]
Examination procedure18.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
11.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2007Fee for grant paid
23.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.06.2007
DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
IT06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
TR06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
AT01.02.2008
FR01.02.2008
LU01.02.2008
BE28.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
CH29.02.2008
LI29.02.2008
[2010/37]
Former [2010/28]CY06.06.2007
DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
IT06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
AT01.02.2008
FR01.02.2008
LU01.02.2008
BE28.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
CH29.02.2008
LI29.02.2008
Former [2009/33]CY06.06.2007
DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
IT06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
AT01.02.2008
FR01.02.2008
BE28.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
CH29.02.2008
LI29.02.2008
Former [2009/23]DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
IT06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
AT01.02.2008
FR01.02.2008
BE28.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
CH29.02.2008
LI29.02.2008
Former [2009/14]DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
IT06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
FR01.02.2008
BE28.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
CH29.02.2008
LI29.02.2008
Former [2008/48]DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
IT06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
FR01.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
CH29.02.2008
LI29.02.2008
Former [2008/46]DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
IT06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
FR01.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
Former [2008/32]DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
IT06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
FR01.02.2008
Former [2008/23]DK06.06.2007
FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
IT06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
Former [2008/19]FI06.06.2007
GB06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
GR07.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
Former [2008/10]FI06.06.2007
IE06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
PT06.11.2007
Former [2008/09]FI06.06.2007
NL06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
Former [2007/48]FI06.06.2007
SE06.09.2007
ES17.09.2007
Former [2007/47]ES17.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]US4700390  (MACHIDA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 25 - line 29 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 31 *;
 [AD]US4091237  (WOLNOWSKY HOWARD ERVIN, et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *