Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162489

EP1162489 - Focusing drive mechanism for an optical instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leica Microsystems (Schweiz) AG
Max Schmidheiny-Strasse 201
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2003/46]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Leica Microsystems AG
Heinrich-Wild-Strasse
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Soppelsa, Peter
Stockerstrasse 40
9436 Balgach / CH
02 / Loh, Chris
Pasir Ris Street 21, 09-212
Singapore 510 213 / SG
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Reichert, Werner Franz
Leica Microsystems GmbH
Corporate Patents and Trademarks
Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Reichert, Werner F., Dr.
Leica Microsystems AG, Corporate Patents + Trademarks Department, Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
Application number, filing date01102534.306.02.2001
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateDE200012356815.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10023568
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162489
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1162489
Date:04.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02B7/02, G02B21/24, F16H55/28, G02B7/04, F16H19/00
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2002/36]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fokussiertrieb für optische Instrumente[2001/50]
English:Focusing drive mechanism for an optical instrument[2001/50]
French:Mécanisme de focalisation pour instrument d'optique[2001/50]
Examination procedure26.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/27]
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2005Fee for grant paid
25.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17]
Request for further processing for:14.10.2003Request for further processing filed
14.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR04.05.2005
GB06.02.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/27]GB06.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2047532  (LEITZ ERNST GMBH) [Y] 1-5,8-10,17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4652095  (MAURO GEORGE [US]) [Y] 1-10,17 * column 1, lines 28-37; figures 1,4,6 * * column 2, lines 6-18 * * column 2, lines 62-68 *;
 [Y]JPH07332470  ;
 [A]DE9110150U  (JENOPTIK CARL ZEISS JENA GMBH) [A] 1,3,5,8-10 * page 2, lines 10-27 - page 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4130024  (HAYASAKA TOSHIMI, et al) [A] 1,3,5,6 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 9; figure 2 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, [Y] 1,3,5-8,10,17 * abstract *