EP1123885 - Unit for sorting and transferring sheets of glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bottero S.p.A. Via Genova, 82 12010 Cuneo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states BOTTERO S.p.A. Via Genova, 82 12010 Cuneo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattio, Roberto Via del Pozzo, 35 12026 Piasco / IT | 02 /
Bisotto, Sebastiano Via dei Pini, 9 12012 Boves / IT | 03 /
Aimar, Giacomo Via Martiri Libertà, 99 12010 Cervasca / IT | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 01102687.9 | 07.02.2001 | [2001/33] | Priority number, date | IT2000TO00124 | 08.02.2000 Original published format: IT TO000124 | [2001/50] |
Former [2001/33] | IT2001TO00024 | 08.02.2000 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123885 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1123885 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123885 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G49/06 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
B65G49/068 (EP,US);
B65G49/067 (EP,US);
B65G2249/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/19] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anlage zum Sortieren und Überführen von Glasscheiben | [2001/33] | English: | Unit for sorting and transferring sheets of glass | [2001/33] | French: | Dispositif pour ranger et transférer des feuilles de verre | [2001/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 26.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2003 | BE | 28.05.2003 | CH | 28.05.2003 | CY | 28.05.2003 | FI | 28.05.2003 | IT | 28.05.2003 | LI | 28.05.2003 | NL | 28.05.2003 | TR | 28.05.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | LU | 07.02.2004 | ES | 09.02.2004 | IE | 09.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
TR | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
TR | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
ES | 09.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
LU | 07.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0620171 (BYSTRONIC MASCH [CH]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9525688 (LISEC PETER [AT]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19525515 (STUERTZ MASCHBAU [DE]) [A] 1* column 3, line 37 - column 3, line 68; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19826949 (KUNKEL GEORG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 9 - column 2, line 54; figures 1-4 * |