Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1127914

EP1127914 - Foamed starch sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOVAMONT S.p.A.
Via Fauser 8
28100 Novara / IT
[2001/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Bastioli, Angelo
Viale Ancona 26
06034 Foligno, (Perugia) / IT
02 / Bastioli, Catia
Via Della Noce 63
28100 Novara / IT
03 / Lombi, Roberto
Via Fara 51
28100 Novara / IT
04 / Salvati, Piero
Via Della Fiera 39/C
05100 Terni / IT
 [2001/35]
Representative(s)Rambelli, Paolo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]Rambelli, Paolo , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date01103390.914.02.2001
[2001/35]
Priority number, dateIT2000TO0014115.02.2000         Original published format: IT TO000141
[2001/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1127914
Date:29.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1127914
Date:26.09.2001
[2001/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1127914
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08J9/12, B32B5/18, // C08L3/00
[2001/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/24]
Former [2001/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesSI13.03.2002
TitleGerman:Geschäumte Stärkeplatte[2001/35]
English:Foamed starch sheet[2001/35]
French:Plaque d'amidon expansé[2001/35]
Examination procedure13.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/25]
04.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2008Fee for grant paid
22.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Request for further processing for:24.07.2007Request for further processing filed
24.07.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.08.2007Decision despatched
25.03.2005Request for further processing filed
25.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.05.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
19.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
[2012/47]
Former [2012/37]AT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/47]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/49]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
Former [2009/37]FI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5153037  (ALTIERI PAUL A [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 7, lines 9-38 * * column 4, lines 4-44 * * column 6, lines 42-45 * * claim - * [A] 24;
 [X]US5437924  (DECKER III WILLIAM C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 33-60 * * claim - *
by applicantEP0696611
 EP0118240
 EP0327505