Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1132434

EP1132434 - Method for preparing organic pigments [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  01.04.2011
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 21.09.2011  [2011/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION
35 Waterview Boulevard
Parsippany, NJ 07054-1285 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/18]For all designated states
Sun Chemical Corporation
35 Waterview Boulevard
Parsippany, NJ 07054-1285 / US
Former [2003/36]For all designated states
Sun Chemical Corporation
222 Bridge Plaza South
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US
Former [2001/37]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schulz, Gregory R.
394 Fern House Walk
Mt. Pleasant, SC 29464 / US
 [2001/37]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2003/23]Vossius & Partner
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2003/19]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/37]Feldhues, Michael L.F., Dr.
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft, Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date01103566.420.02.2001
[2001/37]
Priority number, dateUS2000051874703.03.2000         Original published format: US 518747
[2001/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1132434
Date:12.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1132434
Date:14.11.2001
[2001/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1132434
Date:10.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09B67/04, C09D11/00
[2001/46]
Former International [2001/37]C09B67/04
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2002/31]
Former [2001/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung organischer Pigmente[2001/37]
English:Method for preparing organic pigments[2001/37]
French:Procédé de préparation de pigments organiques[2001/37]
Examination procedure14.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/29]
29.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2003Fee for grant paid
08.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.09.2004  04.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Patentabteilung - C6
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
Neustadter Strasse 71-75
68309 Mannheim / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/46]
Opponent(s)01  10.09.2004  04.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Patentabteilung - C6 Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
Neustadter Straße 71-75
D-68309 Mannheim / DE
Former [2008/34]
Opponent(s)01  10.09.2004  04.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
Patentabteilung - C6 Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2004/46]
Opponent(s)01  10.09.2004   
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael, Dr.
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
04.11.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.09.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
25.01.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.01.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.07.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/18]
16.07.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.04.2008Appeal received No.  T0725/08
04.06.2008Statement of grounds filed
16.07.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
03.04.2008Appeal received No.  T0725/08
04.06.2008Statement of grounds filed
16.07.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
16.07.2010Date of oral proceedings
23.07.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH10.12.2003
LI10.12.2003
[2011/38]
Documents cited:Search[PA]WO0037542  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO) [PA] 1-10 * examples 5,6 *;
 [PA]WO0037168  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO) [PA] 1-10 * example 1 *;
 [A]WO9850828  (BEDELLS ALISON DAWN ;MORRIS DANIEL PATRICK (GB); ABHINAVA KUMAR (G) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-5 *;
 [A]WO9813728  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD ;BREWER SCIENCE INC (US)) [A] 1-10 * example - *;
 [A]EP0909799  (TOYO INK MFG CO) [A] 1-10 * example - *;
 [A]EP0894835  (TOYO INK MFG CO) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 14 - line 21 *;
 [A]EP0753552  (TOYO INK MFG CO) [A] 1-10 * example - *;
 [A]EP0732382  (TOYO INK MFG CO) [A] 1-10 * example - *;
 [A]US6031024  (IIDA YASUHARU ET AL) [A] 1-10 * example - *;
 [A]US5913971  (ANDO MOTONORI ET AL) [A] 1-10 * example - *;
 [A]US5770651  (MUELLER HANS-WERNER ET AL) [A] 1-10 * example - *;
 [DA]US4186029  (AIGN VOLKER ET AL) [DA] 1-10 * example - *;
 [DA]US4373930  (ROTHWELL GEOFFREY R) [DA] 1-10 * example - *