Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1132434 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1132434



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 661
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
07.06.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
31.03.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
24.02.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.02.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
16.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
15.02.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
23.07.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 29
29.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.2010 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
16.06.2010 Claims Appeal 3
16.06.2010 Claims Appeal 3
16.06.2010 Claims Appeal 3
16.06.2010 Claims Appeal 3
16.06.2010 Claims Appeal 3
16.06.2010 Claims Appeal 3
16.06.2010 Claims Appeal 3
16.06.2010 Claims Appeal 3
16.06.2010 Claims Appeal 3
16.06.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.05.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
21.05.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.05.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.04.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
24.04.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.04.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
23.04.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.04.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
14.04.2010 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.10.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
15.10.2009 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 1
09.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
25.09.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
11.09.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.09.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
24.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.01.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.12.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
24.10.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
24.10.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.10.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
15.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.09.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
25.06.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.06.2008 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
04.06.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
04.06.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 41
04.06.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
04.06.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
04.06.2008 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
04.06.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
04.06.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
18.04.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
11.04.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
04.04.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.04.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.04.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.04.2008 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.02.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Annex to a communication Opposition 14
25.01.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
25.01.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
25.01.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.01.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Means of redress Opposition 2
25.01.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
25.01.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Text intended for grant Opposition 16
12.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
10.12.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
23.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2007 Claims Opposition 3
16.11.2007 Claims Opposition 3
16.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
15.11.2007 Claims Opposition 3
15.11.2007 Claims Opposition 3
15.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
12.11.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.09.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.09.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.09.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.08.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
31.08.2007 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.08.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.01.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
08.09.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
31.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.07.2005 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.07.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.07.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.06.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.05.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.05.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.03.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
09.03.2005 Request for change of address Opposition 1
25.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.11.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.11.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.09.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.09.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 10
10.09.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.09.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.09.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
10.09.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.09.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.09.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
10.09.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.10.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.10.2003 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
08.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
08.09.2003 Description Search / examination 2
08.09.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
08.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
18.07.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
07.07.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 18
07.07.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
29.04.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.04.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.04.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
25.04.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.04.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
24.03.2003 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.03.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.03.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.11.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.09.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
27.09.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.09.2001 European search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
05.03.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.03.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
20.02.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.02.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
20.02.2001 Description Search / examination 29
20.02.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.02.2001 Priority document Search / examination 36
20.02.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6