Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236517

EP1236517 - Method of manufacturing a liquid droplet spray device and such spray device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microflow Engineering SA
Jaquet-Droz, 1
2007 Neuchâtel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Microflow Engineering SA
Rue Jaquet-Droz, 1
2007 Neuchâtel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Hess, Joseph
Vignes Perdues 17
2022 Bevaix / CH
02 / Luginbuhl, Philippe
Chemin de plein vent 79 F
2518 Nods / CH
03 / Flick, Jean-Marc
Place du Tilleul 1
2065 Savagnier / CH
04 / Weber, Raphael
Rue Fritz-Courvoisier 9
2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH
05 / Hu, Bo
Avenue Fornachon 17b
2034 Peseux / CH
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25
1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH
Former [2002/36]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date01103653.023.02.2001
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236517
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B05B17/06, A61M15/00
[2002/36]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/21]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Tröpfchen-Verneblers und ein solcher Vernebler[2002/36]
English:Method of manufacturing a liquid droplet spray device and such spray device[2002/36]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un nébuliseur de goutelettes et un tel nébuliseur[2002/36]
Examination procedure09.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/50]
05.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0985534  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * column 7, line 25 - column 13, line 5; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO0006388  (GENSPEC S A [CH], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 27; figure - *;
 [A]EP1005917  (MICROFLOW ENG SA [CH]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 10, line 9 - column 12, line 24; figure - *;
 [A]US5160577  (DESHPANDE NARAYAN V [US]) [A] 1,6,7 * figure 5 *;
 [A]EP1022063  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 45 - line 52 * * page 9, line 7 - line 9; figure 21 *