Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1168795

EP1168795 - Display of the original called party in case of call forwarding [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.12.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tenovis GmbH & Co. KG
Kleyerstrasse 94
60362 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2002/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Rodewald, Frank
Pützer Strasse 22
50181 Bedburg / DE
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2002/01]Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date01104393.223.02.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateDE200013175929.06.2000         Original published format: DE 10031759
[2002/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1168795
Date:02.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1168795
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/54
[2002/01]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/23]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anzeige des ursprünglich gerufenen Teilnehmers bei Anrufweiterschaltung[2002/01]
English:Display of the original called party in case of call forwarding[2002/01]
French:Affichage de l'abonné appelé initial en cas d'un renvoi d'appel[2002/01]
Examination procedure19.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/06]
13.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/06]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.05.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
06.05.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
06.05.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5222124  (CASTANEDA MARIO [US], et al) [X] 1,12,13 * column 3 - column 5 * [Y] 2-11;
 [Y]  ITU, "CALL OFFERING SUPPLEMENTARY SERVICES-ISDN", ITU-T I.252, (19890101), URL: http://www.ihserc.com/cgi-bin/dodiss2?201=763241434600000678228003707530160402720001543160820981384201131&sess=482723616&prod=SPECS2&200=FirstSearch&27=1&25=5, (20020619), XP002202765 [Y] 2-11 * page 247 - page 248 *