Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236422

EP1236422 - Bottle rack, especially for wine bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baur, Thomas R.
Rüdener Strasse 59
73733 Esslingen / DE
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Vetter, Hans
Patentanwälte, Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel, Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Vetter, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.
Patentanwälte, Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel, Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date01104655.424.02.2001
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236422
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47B73/00
[2002/36]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/21]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flaschenregal, insbesondere für Weinflaschen[2002/36]
English:Bottle rack, especially for wine bottles[2002/36]
French:Ranges-bouteilles, notamment pour des bouteilles de vin[2002/36]
Examination procedure05.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/49]
02.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/49]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
14.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
14.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE19719666  (OBKIRCHER TECH BUERO GES M B H [AT]) [DA] 1-11 * column 2, line 22 - line 29 * * column 2, line 41 - line 48 * * column 6, line 16 - line 20 * * column 7, line 68 - column 8, line 9; figure 11 *;
 [A]EP0666042  (SANBRI [FR]) [A] 1,5,10,11 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4, line 36 - line 40; figures 1,15 *;
 [A]US4567989  (HURST JR E GERALD [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 58 - line 62 * * column 4, line 9 - line 13 * * column 4, line 38 - line 47; figures 1,2 *