Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1139279

EP1139279 - Card-type recording medium and card-type recording medium reader [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuetrek Co., Ltd.
1-8-48, Nishimiyahara, Yodogawa-ku
Osaka / JP
[2001/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Ishibe, Hiroshi, c/o Fuetrek Co., Ltd.
Hanahara-dairoku Bldg, 8-31, Nishinakajima 6-chome
Yodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0011 / JP
 [2001/40]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date01104885.728.02.2001
[2001/40]
Priority number, dateJP2000005395729.02.2000         Original published format: JP 2000053957
[2001/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1139279
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1139279
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07, G06F15/78, G11C17/00, H01L27/112, H01L21/8246
[2003/14]
Former International [2001/40]G06K19/07
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/11]
Former [2001/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kartenförmiger Speicher und Lesegerät für einen derartigen Speicher[2001/40]
English:Card-type recording medium and card-type recording medium reader[2001/40]
French:Mémoire de type carte et lecteur pour une telle mémoire[2001/40]
Examination procedure23.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/35]
24.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/03]
18.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH10143441  ;
 [PX]US6089460  (HAZAMA KATSUKI [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [XY]EP0866613  (CANAL PLUS SA [FR]) [X] 1-3 * figure 2 * [Y] 4-6;
 [Y]US6023781  (HAZAMA KATSUKI [JP]) [Y] 4-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - line 27 * * column 23, line 9 - line 17 *;
 [Y]EP0725401  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 9,10 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 34 - line 47 * * column 5, line 54 - line 57 * * column 7, line 42 - line 57 * * column 8, line 52 - line 55 *;
 [Y]EP0887742  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,4,5,9,10 * column 3, line 5 - line 11 * * column 4, line 19 - line 28 * * column 4, line 42 - line 43 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 1,4-6,9,10