Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1129868

EP1129868 - Bearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[2007/43]
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka
542-8502 / JP
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toda, Kazutoshi, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo--ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
02 / Deguchi, Masaru, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo--ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
03 / Kashiwagi, Shinichirou, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo--ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
04 / Mitarai, Tadashi, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo--ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
05 / Ishii, Tomohiro, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo--ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
06 / Tomita, Daisaku, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo--ku
Osaka 542-0081 / JP
 [2001/36]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51
33617 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date01105120.802.03.2001
[2001/36]
Priority number, dateJP2000005847403.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000058474
JP2000020793110.07.2000         Original published format: JP 2000207931
[2001/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1129868
Date:05.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1129868
Date:07.09.2005
[2005/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1129868
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:B60B27/00
[2001/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/21]
Former [2001/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Lagervorrichtung[2001/36]
English:Bearing device[2001/36]
French:Dispositif de palier[2001/36]
Examination procedure01.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/44]
04.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2007Fee for grant paid
04.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0718513  (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1a,1b; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0736398  (SKF IND SPA [IT]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0854303  (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *