Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237080

EP1237080 - Testing of a computer system whether locked memory regions have been released after termination of a process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.06.2006  [2006/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Frisch, Norbert
Bertha von Suttner Weg 1
82152 Martinsried / DE
 [2002/36]
Application number, filing date01105177.802.03.2001
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1237080
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/46, G06F11/14
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
TitleGerman:Überprüfung eines Computersystems auf gesperrte Speicherbereiche nach einem Abbruch eines Prozesses[2002/36]
English:Testing of a computer system whether locked memory regions have been released after termination of a process[2002/36]
French:Test d'un système informatique pour déterminer si les régions de mémoire ont été libérées après interruption d'un processus[2002/36]
Examination procedure07.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
29.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
12.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0778525  (NCR INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 8 * * column 3, line 35 - line 40 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 2 * * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 15 *;
 [A]US5367637  (WEI SHUANG N [US]) [A] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * abstract * * column 7, line 32 - line 53 *;
 [A]US6101525  (HECKER MARK BENNETT [US]) [A] 1-11,13-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - line 54 * * column 3, line 13 - line 15 * * column 4, line 10 - line 21 * * column 5, line 54 - line 63 * * column 6, line 25 - line 30 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0738971  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 12 * abstract * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 18 *
 [Y]  "FREE STORAGE TRACKING UTILITY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,IBM CORP. NEW YORK,US, (19890401), vol. 31, no. 11, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 106 - 107, XP000070000 [Y] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * the whole document *