Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241742

EP1241742 - Electrical apparatus, specially multiple plug, for the installation in a cable conduct [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GIRA GIERSIEPEN GmbH & Co. KG
Dahlienstrasse 12
D-42477 Radevormwald / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
GIRA GIERSIEPEN GmbH. & CO. KG.
Dahlienstrasse 12
D-42477 Radevormwald / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Panknin, Jürgen
Tuchstrasse 21
42477 Radevormwald / DE
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Postfach 13 01 13
42028 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Postfach 13 01 13
42028 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date01105428.513.03.2001
[2002/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1241742
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R24/06
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2003/23]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektrisches Installationsgerät, insbesondere Mehrfach-Steckdose, zum Einsetzen in einen Kabelkanal[2002/38]
English:Electrical apparatus, specially multiple plug, for the installation in a cable conduct[2002/38]
French:Appareil électrique, spécialement prise multiple, pour l'usage dans un conduit de câbles[2002/38]
Examination procedure24.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
23.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR
25.09.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/48]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
03.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4274696  (LONG WILLIAM B, et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 65; figure 6 * [Y] 7-9,11-15,17-19;
 [Y]EP0392193  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 7-9,11-15,17-19 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 45; figure 1 *