Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238827

EP1238827 - Tread pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.10.2005  [2005/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HANEBUTH, Katja
Ferdinand-Wallbrecht-Str.77
30163 Hannover / DE
02 / METZ, Markus
Arndtstr. 12
30167 Hannover / DE
03 / JENNE, Frank
Scheinerstr. 128
85051 Ingolstadt / DE
04 / WACKERHAGE, Tanja
Buschweg 22
31228 Peine / DE
05 / SYCH, Thomas
Patoor-Tomfohrde-Str.11
30900 Wedemark / DE
 [2002/37]
Application number, filing date01105561.306.03.2001
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1238827
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238827
Date:03.11.2004
Language:DE
[2004/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/03, B60C11/13, B60C11/12, // B60C115:00
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/22]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Reifenprofil[2002/37]
English:Tread pattern[2002/37]
French:Sculpture de bande de roulement[2002/37]
Examination procedure11.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
21.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2004Fee for grant paid
01.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH09300917  ;
 [A]JPH09226322  ;
 [A]US5105864  (WATANABE SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0722851  (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09300917 A 19971125 (TOYO TIRE &RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09226322 A 19970902 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0788898