blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1132369

EP1132369 - Malic acid and oxalacetic acid derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.06.2005  [2005/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-1112 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/37]For all designated states
Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1, Teppo-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-1112 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishii, Yasutaka
19-2, Bessyohonmachi
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1112 / JP
02 / Nakano, Tatsuya
22-4, Arashiyama-cho
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0029 / JP
 [2001/37]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/37]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01105607.406.03.2001
[2001/37]
Priority number, dateJP2000006768010.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000067680
[2001/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1132369
Date:12.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1132369
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:C07C69/716, C07C69/675, C07C59/29, C07C59/353
[2001/37]
CPC:
C07C69/716 (EP,US); C07C69/675 (EP,US); C07C2603/00 (EP,US);
C07C2603/74 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/23]
Former [2001/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Derivate der Äpfelsäure und der Oxalessigsäure[2001/37]
English:Malic acid and oxalacetic acid derivatives[2001/37]
French:Dérivés de l'acide malique et de l'acide oxalacétique[2001/37]
Examination procedure24.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
13.03.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.07.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
18.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2004Fee for grant paid
27.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.04.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]  - WILHELM WISLICENUS ET AL., "Desmotrope Formen bei Oxalessigester-Derivaten,insbesondere beim Diphenyl-methyl-oxalessigester oder Oxal-beta-beta-diphenyl propionsäureester", BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT., VERLAG CHEMIE. WEINHEIM., DE, (1917), vol. 50, ISSN 0009-2940, pages 250 - 262, XP002171231 [A] 1 * page 261, paragraph 5 - page 262, paragraph 4 *
 [A]  - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, XP002171232 [A] 1 * abstract *
    [ ] - REIMANN, E. ET AL., ARCH.PHARM., Weinheim, DE, (1977), vol. 310, pages 102 - 109
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.