Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1129812

EP1129812 - Laser Instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.02.2006  [2006/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaltenbach & Voigt GmbH & Co. KG
Bismarckring 39
88400 Biberach/Riss / DE
[2003/22]
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
KALTENBACH & VOIGT GmbH & Co.
Bismarckring 39
88400 Biberach/Riss / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Liebermann, Bernd
Malserweg 7
88250 Weingarten / DE
02 / Hack, Alexander
Kiefernweg 2
88400 Bieberach-Rissegg / DE
03 / Hibst, Raimund Dr.
Alte Ziegelei 66
89155 Erbach / DE
04 / Stock, Karl
Im Käppeleswasen 12
73479 Ellwangen / DE
05 / Keller, Ulrich Dr. Prof.
Ferdinand-Sauerbruch-Weg 37
89075 Ulm / DE
 [2001/36]
Representative(s)Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
Application number, filing date01105656.126.08.1997
[2001/36]
Priority number, dateDE199613626506.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19636265
[2001/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1129812
Date:05.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1129812
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1129812
Date:09.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:B23K26/06, A61C1/00, A61N5/06, A61B18/20
[2001/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   IT [2001/36]
TitleGerman:Laserinstrument[2001/36]
English:Laser Instrument[2001/36]
French:Instrument à laser[2001/36]
Examination procedure01.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
21.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2004Fee for grant paid
08.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97114745.9  / EP0827803
Opposition(s)10.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[DXY]DE4038809  (KALTENBACH & VOIGT GMBH) [DX] 1,4,5,7 * figure . * [Y] 2,3,6,8,9;
 [DX]DE4030734  (STEIGER ERWIN [DE]) [DX] 1,4,5,7 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]US4826431  (FUJIMURA YOSHISABURO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figure 4 *;
 [Y]EP0514258  (SLT JAPAN KK [JP]) [Y] 6,8,9 * the whole document *