Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101651

EP1101651 - Semi-automatic shift implementation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
EATON CORPORATION
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Genise, Thomas Alan
449 North Lafayette
Dearborn, Michigan 48128 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Postfach 10 04 61
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Postfach 10 04 61
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
Application number, filing date01105929.223.04.1997
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateUS1996064983030.04.1996         Original published format: US 649830
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101651
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1101651
Date:16.08.2001
[2001/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101651
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60K41/08, F16H63/44, F16H61/02, // F16H59:02, F16H59:40, F16H59:42, F16H59:46, F16H59:70, F16H61:04
[2002/37]
Former International [2001/21]B60K41/08, F16H63/44, // F16H59:02, F16H59:40, F16H59:42, F16H59:46, F16H59:70, F16H61:04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/21]
TitleGerman:Halbautomatische Schaltdurchführung[2001/21]
English:Semi-automatic shift implementation[2001/21]
French:Réalisation semi-automatique de changement de vitesse[2001/21]
Examination procedure09.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
22.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2002Fee for grant paid
10.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97106683.2  / EP0805063
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0427000  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 25 * * column 6, line 33 - line 54 * * figures 2,3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5261298  (MARKYVECH RONALD K [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 43 - line 61 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 39 * * figure -; claims 1,5 *
by applicantUS3429202
 US4561325
 US4455883
 US4663725
 US4944197
 US4754665
 US5193410
 US5390561
 US4722248
 US5038627
 US5053961
 US4850236
 US5105357
 US5435212