Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239307

EP1239307 - Magnetic thin film interference device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.12.2003  [2003/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SICPA HOLDING SA
Avenue de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
SICPA HOLDING S.A.
Avenue de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Seto, Myron
Avenue du Grey 76
1098 Lausanne / CH
02 / Tiller, Thomas
Chemin du Cèdre 21
1030 Bussigny / CH
03 / Müller, Edgar
Avenue de Florimont 28
1006 Lausanne / CH
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Hepp, Dieter , et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Hepp, Dieter , et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Application number, filing date01105952.409.03.2001
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1239307
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/22, C09C1/00
[2002/37]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/22]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Magnetische Dünnschicht-Interferenz-Vorrichtung[2002/37]
English:Magnetic thin film interference device[2002/37]
French:Système magnétique d'interférence de couches minces[2002/37]
Examination procedure12.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/51]
11.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/51]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
23.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
23.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AX]WO9967093  (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,12 * page 12; example 10 * [X] 13,14,16;
 [DX]US4838648  (PHILLIPS ROGER W [US], et al) [DX] 13,14,16,17 * the whole document *;
 [XA]EP0927749  (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH]) [X] 13,14,16 * column 6, line 2 - line 11 * [A] 1,8,10-12;
 [X]GB1568510  (RACAL ZONAL LTD) [X] 13 * page 2, line 74 - line 78 *;
 [A]US6150022  (COULTER KENT E [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * figure 6 *;
 [A]US5510163  (SULLIVAN BRIAN T [CA], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 9, line 15 - line 47 *;
 [A]US4629647  (SANDER HELFRIED [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 8, line 29 - line 62 *