EP1145929 - Actuator for rail vehicle brakes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Starck, Günter Sonnenhang 20 85304 Ilmmünster / DE | 02 /
Yener, Mehmet Guardinistrasse 135 81375 München / DE | [2001/42] | Application number, filing date | 01106485.4 | 26.03.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | DE2000118514 | 14.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10018514 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1145929 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1145929 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145929 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B61H7/00, B61H7/08 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
B61H7/086 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/42] | B61H7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/42] | Title | German: | Betätigungseinrichtung für eine Schienenbremse | [2001/42] | English: | Actuator for rail vehicle brakes | [2001/42] | French: | Appareil de mise en action des freins de véhicules ferroviaires | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 22.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.11.2004 | IE | 24.11.2004 | TR | 24.11.2004 | GR | 24.02.2005 | CY | 26.03.2005 | LU | 26.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | PT | 24.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | GB | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
CY | 26.03.2005 | ||
LU | 26.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | GB | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
CY | 26.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | GB | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | GB | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | GB | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GB | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | IE | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | GR | 24.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE539775 (AEG) [X] 1,2,4,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2103354 (FARMER CLYDE C) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]CH372337 (SCHWEIZ WAGONS AUFZUEGEFAB [CH]) [X] 1-6,8,11-13 * page 1, line 63 - page 2, line 58; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE1903315 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH) [X] 1,2,4-15 * page 9 - page 11; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE2415858 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH) [A] 5* the whole document *; | [X]FR2544406 (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7,14,15 * the whole document * |