Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1137138

EP1137138 - Release for encapsulated switchgear [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.04.2003  [2003/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fritz Driescher KG Spezialfabrik für Elektrizitätswerksbedarf GmbH & Co.
Industriestrasse 2
D-41844 Wegberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]For all designated states
Fritz Driescher KG, Spezialfabrik für Elektrizitätswerksbedarf GmbH & Co.
Industriestrasse 2
D-41844 Wegberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bünger, Stefan
Rheinweg 191c
41812 Erkelenz / DE
02 / Nellen, Udo
An der Erfthalle 3
41517 Grevenbroich / DE
03 / Wirtz, Gottfried
Heerstrasse 29
41844 Wegberg / DE
 [2001/39]
Representative(s)Bergen, Klaus
Patentanwalt Alt-Niederkassel 75
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]Bergen, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Alt-Niederkassel 75
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date01106641.216.03.2001
[2001/39]
Priority number, dateDE200011302517.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10013025
DE200012218506.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10022185
[2001/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1137138
Date:26.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1137138
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H02B13/065
[2001/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Auslöser für eine gekapselte Schaltanlage[2001/39]
English:Release for encapsulated switchgear[2001/39]
French:Déclencheur pour interrupteur blindé[2001/39]
Examination procedure01.03.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/17]
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3131417  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 23 - page 24; figure 8 * [A] 3;
 [X]DE4330410  (SACHSENWERK AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 43 *