Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241729

EP1241729 - Dielectric filter and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TDK Corporation
13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
TDK Corporation
13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Gotoh, Masashi
c/o TDK Corp., 13-1,Nihonbashi, 1-chome,Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Tashiro, Kouji
c/o TDK Corp., 13-1,Nihonbashi, 1-chome,Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01106723.816.03.2001
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1241729
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01P1/205
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2003/23]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dielektrisches Filter und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[2002/38]
English:Dielectric filter and method of manufacturing the same[2002/38]
French:Filtre diélectrique et sa méthode de fabrication[2002/38]
Examination procedure03.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/05]
28.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
09.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
04.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
10.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/22]
08.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2008/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9530250  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * page 2, line 33 - page 4, line 25 * * page 7, line 14 - line 19 * * page 9, line 10 - line 16 * * page 14, line 12 - line 18 * * figures 2,3,9 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US5537082  (TADA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 10 * * figure 1A * * abstract *;
 [A]US4220810  (ARAI MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-5,9,10 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 4 * * figures 2-5 * * abstract *;
 [A]EP0797266  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 17 * * figures 5-7 *;
 [A]JPS6243904
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870723), vol. 011, no. 227, Database accession no. (E - 526), [A] 1,6-10 * abstract * * figure - *