Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1138782

EP1138782 - Multiplex sequence variation analysis of DNA samples by mass spectrometry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.08.2011
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 30.10.2013  [2013/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bruker Daltonik GmbH
Fahrenheitstrasse 4
28359 Bremen / DE
[2010/42]
Former [2003/20]For all designated states
Bruker Daltonik GmbH
Fahrenheitstrasse 4
28359 Bremen / DE
Former [2001/40]For all designated states
BRUKER-SAXONIA ANALYTIK GMBH
Permoserstrasse 15
D-04318 Leipzig / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jäschke, Andres
Am Heidesaum 2A
14109 Berlin / DE
02 / Hausch, Felix
844 Cedro Way
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
 [2001/40]
Application number, filing date01106974.721.03.2001
[2001/40]
Priority number, dateDE200011579726.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10015797
[2001/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1138782
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1138782
Date:05.02.2003
[2003/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1138782
Date:20.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2001/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/40]
TitleGerman:Multiplex Sequenzvariationsanalyse von DNA-Proben mittels Massenspektrometrie[2001/40]
English:Multiplex sequence variation analysis of DNA samples by mass spectrometry[2001/40]
French:Variation multiplex de séquence pour l'analyse des échantillons d'ADN par spectrométrie de masse[2001/40]
Examination procedure18.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/40]
24.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2010Fee for grant paid
07.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201010   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2010
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
CY20.10.2010
DK20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
IT20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
TR20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
ES31.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
IE21.03.2011
LU21.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
[2013/44]
Former [2013/26]AT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
CY20.10.2010
DK20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
IT20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
ES31.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
IE21.03.2011
LU21.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2013/25]AT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
DK20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
IT20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
ES31.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
IE21.03.2011
LU21.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2012/08]AT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
DK20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
IT20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
ES31.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
IE21.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2012/07]AT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
DK20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
IT20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
ES31.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2012/03]AT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
DK20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
IT20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
ES31.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2011/49]AT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
DK20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
ES31.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2011/40]AT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
DK20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
ES31.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
Former [2011/35]AT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
ES31.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
Former [2011/31]AT20.10.2010
BE20.10.2010
FI20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
GR21.01.2011
PT21.02.2011
Former [2011/24]FI20.10.2010
NL20.10.2010
SE20.10.2010
PT21.02.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9902728  (BRAX GENOMICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-34 * claims 1-20 * * page 2 - page 9 * * page 13 - page 21 * * page 26 - page 27 * * page 29 *;
 [X]US5872003  (KOESTER HUBERT [US]) [X] 1-34 * claims 1-4 * * column 3 - column 10 *;
 [PX]EP1234888  (BRUKER SAXONIA ANALYTIK GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-34 * the whole document *
 [X]  - GRIFFIN T J ET AL, "Single-nucleotide polymorphism analysis by MALDI-TOF mass spectrometry", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200002), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 77 - 84, XP004187253 [X] 1-34 * page 77 - page 82 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(99)01401-8