Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1244072

EP1244072 - Method for dynamical calculation of wageringquote in a wagering game and computer program for its execution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scaraboo Entwicklungsgesellschaft mbH
Georg-Wulf-Str. 4-6
28199 Bremen / DE
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Virkus, Robert
Am Dobben 28
28203 Bremen / DE
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Goddar, Heinz J., Dr.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01107014.121.03.2001
[2002/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1244072
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G07C15/00
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur dynamischen Berechnung von Wettquoten eines Wettspiels und Computerprogramm zur Durchführung desselben[2002/39]
English:Method for dynamical calculation of wageringquote in a wagering game and computer program for its execution[2002/39]
French:Procédé pour le calcul dynamique de quotes de pari pour un jeu de pari et programme d'ordinateur pour le réaliser[2002/39]
Examination procedure22.03.2001Examination requested  [2002/39]
01.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
04.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] Keine Recherche