Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243321

EP1243321 - Microcapsules (IX) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Primacare S.L., c/o Cognis Iberica S.L.
Sector E, c/No. 42, Zona Franca
08040 Barcelona / ES
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Viladot Petit, Josep-Lluis
Rbla/ Poblenou 133, 2e 3a
08018 Barcelona / ES
02 / De Moragas, Maria
C/Sant Narcis, 28, Bajos
08310 Argentona (Barcelona) / ES
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Fabry, Bernd
Cognis GmbH
Postfach 13 01 64
40551 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Fabry, Bernd
Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64
40551 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2002/39]Fabry, Bernd, Dr.
c/o Cognis Deutschland GmbH, Dep. Intellectual Properties, Postfach 130164
40551 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date01107152.922.03.2001
[2002/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243321
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01J13/02
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
TitleGerman:Mikrokapseln(IX)[2002/39]
English:Microcapsules (IX)[2002/39]
French:Microcapsules (IX)[2002/39]
Examination procedure22.03.2001Examination requested  [2002/39]
26.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/45]
16.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/45]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]WO0147625  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [E] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9822210  (MERCK S A [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS62151403  ;
 [A]JPH09221502
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 32, Database accession no. 1987-225878, XP002174022 & JPS62151403 A 19870706 (DAICEL CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 44, Database accession no. 1997-475486, XP002174023 & JPH09221502 A 19970826 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-16 * abstract *