blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1150139

EP1150139 - Multilayer system with protecting layer system and production method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss SMT AG
Rudolf-Eber-Strasse 2
73447 Oberkochen / DE
[2006/52]
Former [2004/35]For all designated states
Carl Zeiss SMT AG
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Carl Zeiss SMT AG
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73446 Oberkochen / DE
Former [2004/31]For all designated states
Carl Zeiss
89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
For:GB 
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as Carl Zeiss
89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
Carl Zeiss
D-89520 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
For:GB 
CARL ZEISS-STIFTUNG HANDELND ALS CARL ZEISS
D-89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bijkerk, Frederik, Dr.
Lauriergracht 13
1016 RD Amsterdam / NL
02 / Louis, Eric, Dr.
Topaashof 3
3402 ZG Ijsselstein / NL
03 / Yakshin, Andrey E., Dr.
Kamperveste 2
3432 BD Nieuwegein / NL
04 / Görts, Peter Cornelis, Dr.
Noordeindestraat 13
3523 VJ Utrecht / NL
05 / Oestreich, Sebastian, Dr.
Stadhoudersstraat 56
PR Rijswijk / NL
 [2001/44]
Representative(s)Schultz, Jörg Martin, et al
Carl Zeiss AG
Patentabteilung
73446 Oberkochen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/09]Schultz, Jörg Martin, et al
Carl Zeiss AG Patentabteilung
73446 Oberkochen / DE
Former [2004/34]Müller-Rissmann, Werner Albrecht, Dr., et al
Carl Zeiss, Patentabteilung
73446 Oberkochen / DE
Former [2001/44]Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date01107215.423.03.2001
[2001/44]
Priority number, dateDE200011600831.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10016008
[2001/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1150139
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1150139
Date:07.01.2004
[2004/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1150139
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:G02B1/10, G21K1/06
[2001/44]
CPC:
G02B5/0891 (EP,US); B82Y10/00 (EP,US); G02B1/115 (EP,US);
G02B5/208 (EP,US); G02B5/283 (EP,US); G03F1/24 (EP,US);
G03F7/708 (EP,US); G21K1/062 (EP,US); G21K2201/067 (EP,US);
Y10T428/16 (EP,US); Y10T428/24942 (EP,US); Y10T428/30 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/44]
TitleGerman:Mehrschichtsystem mit Schutzschichtsystem und Herstellungsverfahren[2001/44]
English:Multilayer system with protecting layer system and production method[2001/44]
French:Système multicouche avec couche protectrice et procédé de fabrication[2001/44]
Examination procedure01.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
18.08.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2006Fee for grant paid
08.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Request for further processing for:02.06.2006Request for further processing filed
02.06.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.06.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
IT21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
TR21.02.2007
IE23.03.2007
LU23.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
IT21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
IE23.03.2007
LU23.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2009/33]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
IT21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
IE23.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/23]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
IT21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
IE23.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/19]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
IE23.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/10]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
IE23.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/09]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/48]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/46]AT21.02.2007
CH21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
Former [2007/39]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
ES01.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
Former [2007/37]CH21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
LI21.02.2007
Former [2007/36]FI21.02.2007
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search
ExaminationUS5310603
 WO9924851
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN
    - J.H. UNDERWOOD ET AL., "Tarnishing of MO/SI multilayer x-ray mirrors", APPLIED OPTICS, (19931201), vol. 32, no. 34, pages 6985 - 6990
    - C. MONTCALM ET AL., SPIE, (199802), vol. 3331, pages 42 - 51, XP000908927

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.309600
    - M. CILIA AND J. VERHOEVEN, "Ni/Si based multilayer for the reflection of soft x rays in the "water window"", J. APPL. PHYS., (19971101), vol. 82, no. 9, pages 4137 - 4142
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.