blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1150491

EP1150491 - Digital photo processing apparatus and printing data recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD.
579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi
Wakayama / JP
[2009/12]
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD.
579-1 Umehara
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nozaki, Iwao
c/o Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd., Umehara 579-1
Wakayama-shi, wakayama-ken / JP
 [2001/44]
Representative(s)LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/02]Lemcke, Brommer & Partner
Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [2001/44]Petersen, Frank, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47
76058 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date01107243.623.03.2001
[2001/44]
Priority number, dateJP2000008844928.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000088449
[2001/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1150491
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1150491
Date:06.04.2005
[2005/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1150491
Date:18.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2005
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/32
[2001/44]
CPC:
H04N1/00148 (EP,US); H04N1/00132 (EP,US); H04N1/00167 (EP,US);
H04N1/00172 (EP,US); H04N1/00175 (EP,US); H04N1/00188 (EP,US);
H04N1/33376 (EP,US); H04N1/3875 (EP,US); H04N2201/0051 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0082 (EP,US); H04N2201/0084 (EP,US); H04N2201/0087 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0089 (EP,US); H04N2201/33328 (EP,US); H04N2201/33357 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/52]
Former [2001/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Digitalphotoverarbeitungsgerät und Druckdatenaufzeichnungsverfahren[2001/44]
English:Digital photo processing apparatus and printing data recording method[2001/44]
French:Dispositif de traitement de photographies numériques et procédé d'enregistrement de données d'impression[2001/44]
Examination procedure07.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/31]
31.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2009Fee for grant paid
13.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR18.05.2009
GB18.06.2009
[2010/47]
Former [2010/25]GB18.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH06291987  ;
 [A]JPH08123630  ;
 [A]JPH1016321  ;
 [A]US5016114  (SAKATA SEIJI [JP], et al);
 [Y]EP0467598  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 2-8 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 18 * * column 4, line 10 - line 26 *;
 [Y]EP0869660  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,8 * page 2, line 13 - line 20 * * page 3, line 11 - line 30 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06291987 A 19941018 (CANON INC) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-8
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08123630 A 19960517 (CANON INC) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10016321 A 19980120 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.