Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239265

EP1239265 - System and method for displaying geographic images [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.04.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2010  [2010/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
Former [2007/22]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Siemens Schweiz AG
Albisriederstrasse 245, Postfach
8047 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Marty, Felix
Samstagernstrasse 56D
8832 Wollerau / CH
02 / Sigg, Urs
Rötelstraase 20
8006 Zürich / CH
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2008/28]
Former [2008/02]Maier, Daniel Oliver , et al
Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2002/37]Berg, Peter , et al
European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date01107547.026.03.2001
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateEP2001010577908.03.2001         Original published format: EP 01105779
[2002/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239265
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239265
Date:18.10.2006
[2006/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/20, G09B29/10
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2007/26]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Darstellung von geographischen Abbildungen[2002/37]
English:System and method for displaying geographic images[2002/37]
French:Système et procédé pour afficher des images géographiques[2002/37]
Examination procedure07.11.2006Examination requested  [2006/51]
18.04.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.08.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
09.07.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/19]
28.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.05.2007BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007SE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2007TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3802337  (MESSERSCHMITT-BOELKOW-BLOHM GMBH, 8012 OTTOBRUNN, DE) [A] 1,10,19,20 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1024467  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,19,20 * paragraphs [0034] , [0038] - [0050]; figures 1-16 *