blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1138644

EP1138644 - Mass and shaped bodies formed thereof , having a surface effect [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.02.2004  [2004/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dörge, Friedhelm
Am Park 8
17217 Mollenstorf / DE
[2001/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/40]
Representative(s)Voss, Karl-Heinz
Zum Gutshof 6
17036 Neubrandenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]Voss, Karl-Heinz
Kruseshofer Strasse 20
17036 Neubrandenburg / DE
Application number, filing date01107577.727.03.2001
[2001/40]
Priority number, dateDE200011519827.03.2000         Original published format: DE 10015198
DE200015050711.10.2000         Original published format: DE 10050507
[2001/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1138644
Date:04.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1138644
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:C04B26/06, C04B20/00
[2004/02]
CPC:
B29C67/243 (EP); B44C3/04 (EP); B44D2/00 (EP);
B44F1/10 (EP); C04B26/06 (EP); C04B2111/0075 (EP);
C04B2111/807 (EP); Y02W30/91 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C04B26/06, C04B14/22, C04B14/303, C04B18/20, C04B18/24, C04B20/0076 (EP)
Former IPC [2001/40]C04B26/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Masse und daraus geformte Körper mit Oberflächeneffekt[2001/40]
English:Mass and shaped bodies formed thereof , having a surface effect[2001/40]
French:Masse et corps façonnés à partir de cette masse, présentant un effet de surface[2001/40]
Examination procedure20.12.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2003
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0983977  (DOPPEL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,7,11,15 * Zusammenfassung;; examples 1,4; claims 1,15 *;
 [Y]EP0905102  (DOPPEL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,7,11,15-17 * page 1, lines 5-8; examples 1,3 *;
 [Y]JPH09110502  ;
 [Y]JPH03271145  ;
 [A]WO9957076  (MBT HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 29, paragraph 1; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3809937  (SF VOLLVERBUNDSTEIN [DE]) [A] 1-20 * claims 1,3,16 *;
 [A]FR1263054  (GLAS UND SPIEGEL MANUFACTUR A) [A] 1,16-20 * claims 1-3 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09110502 A 19970428 (TAKAGI KOGYO KK;KURIETETSUKU:KK) [Y] 1,2,15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 03, Database accession no. 1992-021439, XP002261049 & JPH03271145 A 19911203 (AIKA KOGYO KK) [Y] 1,2,5,15-17 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.