blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1143060

EP1143060 - Device for drying laundry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.06.2004  [2004/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brüning, Manfred
Miesingstr. 1
81379 München / DE
For all designated states
Leimbach, Martin
Trumppstr. 7a
80997 München / DE
[2001/41]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/41]
Representative(s)Baronetzky, Klaus
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date01107755.903.04.2001
[2001/41]
Priority number, dateDE200011650603.04.2000         Original published format: DE 10016506
[2001/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1143060
Date:10.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1143060
Date:19.03.2003
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:D06F57/00, D06F53/00
[2001/41]
CPC:
D06F57/00 (EP); D06F53/005 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/41]
TitleGerman:Wäschetrocknungsvorrichtung[2001/41]
English:Device for drying laundry[2001/41]
French:Dispositif pour sécher le linge[2001/41]
Examination procedure20.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/27]
20.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.10.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200303   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2003
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0526829  (METALTEX SA [CH]) [X] 1,8 * page 1 *;
 [X]DE4034318  (VENHAUS ADOLF [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [X]FI80081B  (JAEAEHDYTYSKONE OY [FI]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]DE582803  (CARL WEDLER) [A] 1,11,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3004040  (GERDES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PX]DE20003430U  (BRUENING MANFRED [DE], et al) [PX] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [PX]SE9901499  (BRITT KLINGSDAL) [PX] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.