Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1132478

EP1132478 - Helper virus for the preparation of recombinant viral recombinants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2006  [2006/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRANSGENE S.A.
11, rue de Molsheim
67000 Strasbourg / FR
[2001/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Lusky, Monika
Kapellenweg 18
79110 Freiburg / DE
02 / Mehtali, Majid
Sportlaan 277
2566 KK The Hague / NL
 [2001/37]
Representative(s)Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/37]Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date01108475.330.07.1996
[2001/37]
Priority number, dateFR1995000928931.07.1995         Original published format: FR 9509289
[2001/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1132478
Date:12.09.2001
Language:FR
[2001/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1132478
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/86, C12N7/01, C12N5/10, A61K48/00
[2001/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/37]
TitleGerman:Hilfsvirus für die Herstellung von Rekombimanten Virusvektoren[2001/37]
English:Helper virus for the preparation of recombinant viral recombinants[2001/37]
French:Virus auxiliaires pour la préparation de vecteurs viraux recombinants[2001/37]
Examination procedure04.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
16.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/34]
06.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/34]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96927107.1  / EP0842279
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
19.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200510   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2707664  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 31; figure 1 * * page 2, line 10 - line 13; claim 19 * * abstract * [Y] 6;
 [A]EP0488528  (APPLIED IMMUNESCIENCES [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0300422  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9640955  (GRAHAM FRANK L [CA], et al) [E] 1-5,7-10 * page 16, line 17 - line 21; figures 1,2,5 * * page 19, line 4 - line 20 *;
 [E]EP0732405  (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) [E] 1,2,7-10 * page 6, line 6 - line 15 * * page 26 *
 [XA]  SAUER, BRIAN ET AL, "Cre -stimulated recombination at loxP -containing DNA sequences placed into the mammalian genome", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES. (1989), 17(1), 147-61 CODEN: NARHAD;ISSN: 0305-1048, XP002002089 [X] 3 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4-10
 [YA]  SAUER, BRIAN ET AL, "Site-specific insertion of DNA into a pseudorabies virus vector", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A. (1987), 84(24), 9108-12 CODEN: PNASA6;ISSN: 0027-8424, XP002002088 [Y] 6 * page 9108, column L, line 46 - line 49; figure 3 * [A] 1-5,7-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.84.24.9108
 [A]  AYRES, ELAINE K. ET AL, "Precise deletions in large bacterial genomes by vector-mediated excision (VEX). The trfA gene of promiscuous plasmid RK2 is essential for replication in several Gram-negative hosts", J. MOL. BIOL. (1993), 230(1), 174-85 CODEN: JMOBAK;ISSN: 0022-2836, XP000568383 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1993.1134