Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1153979

EP1153979 - Functionalised copolymers for the preparation of coating materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  04.03.2011
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wacker Chemie AG
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
[2009/45]
Former [2001/46]For all designated states
Wacker Polymer Systems GmbH & Co. KG
Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24
84489 Burghausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stark, Kurt, Dr.
Hochstaufenstrasse 2
84508 Burgkirchen / DE
02 / Tschirner, Peter, Dr.
Hauptstrasse 10
84547 Emmerting / DE
03 / Ball, Peter, Dr.
Kettelerstrasse 11
84547 Emmerting / DE
04 / Büppelmann, Klaus, Dr.
Buchenstrasse 14
84547 Emmerting / DE
05 / Kotschi, Udo, Dr.
Egerlandstrasse 14
84489 Burghausen / DE
 [2001/46]
Representative(s)Schuderer, Michael , et al
Wacker Chemie AG
Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/46]Schuderer, Michael, Dr. , et al
Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
Application number, filing date01109326.712.04.2001
[2001/46]
Priority number, dateDE200012299211.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10022992
[2001/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1153979
Date:14.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1153979
Date:23.01.2002
[2002/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1153979
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1153979
Date:06.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08L57/04, C09D5/02, C09J157/04, C08F2/22, C08J3/12
[2001/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/46]
TitleGerman:Funktionalisierte Copolymerisate für die Herstellung von Beschichtungsmitteln[2001/46]
English:Functionalised copolymers for the preparation of coating materials[2001/46]
French:Polymères fonctionnalisés pour la préparation de revêtement[2001/46]
Examination procedure12.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
12.04.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
28.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
11.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2003Fee for grant paid
07.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.03.2004   
Celanese Emulsions GmbH
Frankfurterstr. 111
61476 Kronberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ackermann, Joachim
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Ackermann
Postfach 11 13 26
60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/19]
Opponent(s)01  12.03.2004   
Celanese Emulsions GmbH
Frankfurterstr. 111
61476 Kronberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Ackermann, Joachim, Dr.
Postfach 11 13 26
60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE
30.04.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.07.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.08.2004Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2004Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
17.01.2007Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05)
25.06.2010Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.08.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.08.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.01.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.02.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition16.04.2007Appeal received No.  T0621/07
25.06.2007Statement of grounds filed
30.10.2009Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
30.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
09.11.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:27.02.2003Request for further processing filed
07.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.03.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
TR25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
LU12.04.2004
BE30.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
[2007/09]
Former [2006/51]FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
TR25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
LU12.04.2004
BE30.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2006/14]FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
LU12.04.2004
BE30.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2005/28]FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
LU12.04.2004
BE30.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
Former [2005/23]FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
LU12.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
Former [2005/02]FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
MC30.04.2004
Former [2004/29]FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/05]FI25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
Former [2004/02]GR25.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9835994  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-10,14-21 * example 25 *;
 [X]JPH0762036  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,14-21 * examples 9-11 *;
 [X]JPH0948942  (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4,6 * page 12; examples 1-12; table 2 *;
 [X]JPH10218944  (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-10 * page 13; examples 8-12; table 1 *
OppositionEP0215518
 JP2000007882
 EP0898026
 DE1595501
 DE2535372
    - XXIII FATIPEC Congress, Brussels 10-14 June 1996, Volume D, B. Momper "Vinylacetat/Ethylen Copolymerdispersionen als Bindemittel für emissionsarme Innen- und Seidenglanzfarben".,