blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1250914

EP1250914 - Cooling compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.10.2015
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2015Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 25.11.2015  [2015/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2015/48]
Former [2006/22]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2002/43]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Carlucci, Giovanni
Via A. Fieramosca 118
66100 Chieti / IT
02 / Pesce, Antonella
Via L'Aquila 21
65120 Pescara / IT
03 / Meo, Daniela
Via Palestro, 27
84133 Salerno / IT
04 / Di Cintio, Achille
Via Marconi, 177
65126 Pescara / IT
 [2002/43]
Representative(s)Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/48]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Former [2014/04]Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2008/39]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2002/43]Kremer, Véronique, et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date01109352.317.04.2001
[2002/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1250914
Date:23.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1250914
Date:31.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/22]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1250914
Date:25.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61L15/20
[2005/52]
CPC:
A61K8/37 (EP); A61Q19/00 (EP); A61K2800/244 (EP)
Former IPC [2002/43]A61K7/48, A61K7/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2015/48]
Former [2002/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Erfrischende Zusammensetzugen[2002/43]
English:Cooling compositions[2002/43]
French:Compositions de refroidissement[2002/43]
Examination procedure06.09.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
13.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
16.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
06.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
20.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2006Fee for grant paid
11.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.02.2007  02.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 02  28.02.2007  08.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/32]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2007  02.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Dreiss, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 02  28.02.2007  08.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/14]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2007  02.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Langöhrig, Angelika Beate, et al, et al
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 02  28.02.2007  08.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2007/14]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2007   
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Langöhrig, Angelika Beate, et al, et al
Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 103762
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 02  28.02.2007   
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Patente (VTP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
10.04.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.10.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.09.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2009
24.09.2009Date of oral proceedings
29.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
03.12.2009Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.03.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
04.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
12.09.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
25.11.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.03.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.04.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.08.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
15.10.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition18.05.2010Appeal received No.  T1080/10
29.07.2010Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2014Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
21.01.2014Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
CY31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
NL31.05.2006
TR31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
IE17.04.2007
LU17.04.2007
MC30.04.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
CY31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
NL31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
IE17.04.2007
LU17.04.2007
MC30.04.2007
Former [2009/18]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
NL31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
IE17.04.2007
MC30.04.2007
Former [2008/25]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
NL31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
IE17.04.2007
Former [2008/19]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
NL31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/36]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
NL31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/19]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
NL31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/13]AT31.05.2006
BE31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/12]AT31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/09]AT31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
DK31.08.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
Former [2007/03]AT31.05.2006
CH31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
LI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
Former [2006/52]AT31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
Former [2006/51]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
Former [2006/50]SE31.08.2006
ES11.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE31.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH04337395  ;
 [X]JP01066107  ;
 [X]JP2000247859  ;
 [X]JPS57126416  ;
 [X]US4844883  (PATEL HARSHAD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * claims 1-20; table II *;
 [A]JP2000095679  (NAGOYA SPORTS KK) [A] 1,9,10* page 04 *;
 [X]JP2000119132  (TOYO AEROSOL IND CO) [X] 1,2;
 [A]EP0997144  (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1993-011695, XP002181781 & JPH04337395 A 19921125 (KANEBO) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890616), vol. 13, no. 262, Database accession no. (C - 608), & JP01066107 A 19890313 (KANEBO) [X] 1,4-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000247859 A 20000912 (KAO) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2000:266234, XP002181779 [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 37, Database accession no. 1982-77553e, XP002181782 & JPS57126416 A 19820806 (SEKISUI CHEM IND) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2000:214827, XP002181780 [A] 1,9,10 * abstract *
OppositionGB1095505
 DE2608226
 JPH04337395
 WO9323005
 US6001341
 WO0042983
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.