Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1149699 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1149699



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 546
20.02.2020 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
20.02.2020 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
17.02.2020 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
11.11.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.11.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.11.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.11.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.11.2019 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
06.11.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
06.11.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.11.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
27.08.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.08.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.08.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.08.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.08.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.08.2019 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
02.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.08.2019 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2019 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
01.08.2019 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
24.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.07.2019 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
18.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.07.2019 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
03.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.01.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.12.2018 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.11.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.11.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
09.11.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.11.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.09.2018 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 11
05.09.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.09.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
05.09.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
31.08.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
31.08.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.08.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.07.2018 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
26.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.04.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
18.04.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
18.04.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
18.04.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
18.04.2018 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
11.04.2018 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
11.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.04.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.04.2018 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
04.04.2018 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.04.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.11.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
28.11.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
23.11.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.10.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
27.07.2017 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 4
27.07.2017 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 4
27.07.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.07.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.08.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.07.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
17.06.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.06.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.06.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Opposition 1
12.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
06.04.2016 Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 2
06.04.2016 Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 2
01.04.2016 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
13.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.05.2015 Request for a decision Opposition 2
07.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
21.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
21.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
21.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 12
21.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 2
21.04.2015 Request for re-establishment of rights Opposition 4
21.04.2015 Request for re-establishment of rights Opposition 4
20.01.2015 Communication: patent lapsed Opposition 1
20.01.2015 Communication: patent lapsed Opposition 1
15.02.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 15
12.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
12.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
12.02.2013 Claims Opposition 2
12.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.02.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
24.01.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.01.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
07.01.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
28.12.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
07.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.12.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.11.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.08.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.08.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
03.07.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.06.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 30
26.06.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
26.06.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 12
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.06.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.06.2012 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 17
26.06.2012 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.09.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.08.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.08.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
09.08.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.04.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.04.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
11.04.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.04.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
20.05.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
20.05.2008 Description Search / examination 1
20.05.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.03.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.02.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.11.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.05.2007 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
15.01.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.12.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.12.2006 European search report Search / examination 2
10.10.2006 General enquiry Search / examination 1
19.09.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.07.2001 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
25.06.2001 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
19.04.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
19.04.2001 Description Search / examination 9
19.04.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.04.2001 Drawings Search / examination 4
19.04.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
19.04.2001 Translation of priority document Search / examination 20