EP1160898 - Reduced tin oxides as anode active material in electrochemical cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heider, Lilia Lagerstrasse 37a 64560 Riedstadt / DE | 02 /
Lotz, Natascha Am Ohlenberg 31 64390 Erzhausen / DE | 03 /
Sandner, Tanja Mainzer Strasse 64 65428 Rüsselheim / DE | 04 /
Rothenburger, Mathias Wilhelmstrasse 17 55128 Mainz / DE | 05 /
Amann, Anja Erbacher Strasse 28 64395 Brensbach / DE | [2001/49] | Application number, filing date | 01109445.5 | 24.04.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | DE2000125762 | 25.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10025762 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160898 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160898 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1160898 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/48, C01G19/02 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/48 (KR);
C01G19/02 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/04 (KR);
H01M4/364 (EP,US);
H01M4/387 (EP,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M2004/027 (EP,US);
H01M6/166 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/10] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Reduziertes Zinnoxid als Anodenmaterial in elektrochemischen Zellen | [2001/49] | English: | Reduced tin oxides as anode active material in electrochemical cells | [2001/49] | French: | Oxyde d'étain réduit comme matériau anodique d'une cellule électrochimique | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]USRE35818E (TAHARA KENSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * column 13, line 7 - column 14, line 5 *; | [X]EP0867955 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * page 3, line 22 - page 5, line 9 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0855752 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,5-8 * page 11, lines 9-12 * * claim - *; | [E]EP1158587 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0011] * * claims 1,5 * | [DX] - WU G T ET AL, "Editorial(s)", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19980901), vol. 75, no. 1, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 181 - 182, XP004147188 [DX] 1,5-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(98)00066-4 | [X] - COURTNEY I A ET AL, "ELECTROCHEMICAL AND IN SITU X-RAY DIFFRACTION STUDIES OF THE REACTION OF LITHIUM WITH TIN OXIDE COMPOSITES", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, US, (19970601), vol. 144, no. 6, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 2045 - 2052, XP002072409 [X] 1,5-8 * the whole document * | [X] - HUGGINS R A, "Lithium alloy negative electrodes formed from convertible oxides", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19981201), vol. 113-115, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 57 - 67, XP004153277 [X] 1,5,8 * pages 64-65 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2738(98)00275-6 | [X] - LI H ET AL, "Anodes based on oxide materials for lithium rechargeable batteries", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (199908), vol. 123, no. 1-4, ISSN 0167-2738, pages 189 - 197, XP004172930 [X] 1,5,6,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2738(99)00081-8 | [XP] - LEE W H ET AL, "Stoichiometry dependence of electrochemical performance of thin-film SnOx microbattery anodes deposited by radio frequency magnetron sputtering", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (200007), vol. 89, no. 1, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 102 - 105, XP004200307 [XP] 1,3,5,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(00)00382-7 |