blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1149877

EP1149877 - Decolorizable ink composition and ink jet printer using the ink composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Isago, Kohki
4-23, Hiyoshihoncho, Kouhoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-0062 / JP
 [2001/44]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date01109495.025.04.2001
[2001/44]
Priority number, dateJP2000012478025.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000124780
[2001/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1149877
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1149877
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:C09D11/00
[2001/44]
CPC:
C09D11/50 (EP,US); C09D11/30 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/29]
Former [2001/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Entfärbbare Tintenzusammensetzung und Tintenstrahldrucker welcher diese Tintenzusammensetzung verwendet[2001/44]
English:Decolorizable ink composition and ink jet printer using the ink composition[2001/44]
French:Composition d'encre decolorable et imprimante à jet d'encre utilisant cette composition[2001/44]
Examination procedure28.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/15]
16.07.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.08.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
12.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2003Fee for grant paid
09.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.06.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
05.06.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5922115  (SANO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * example 1 *;
 [A]US6017386  (SANO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * example 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0987123  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,2* column 6, line 43 - column 9, line 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.