blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1152199 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1152199



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 417
24.06.2010 Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged Opposition 1
24.06.2010 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
21.06.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
10.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
04.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
04.03.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
04.03.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
04.03.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.12.2009 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.12.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
05.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.12.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
03.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2009 Claims Opposition 3
03.12.2009 Description Opposition 3
03.12.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
03.12.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.12.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
27.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
20.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
16.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
12.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 28
12.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
12.10.2009 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
07.10.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Claims Opposition 3
05.10.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
07.09.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.06.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.06.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
29.06.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
29.06.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.01.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
04.12.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2006 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
28.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.09.2006 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.06.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
01.06.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.05.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 16
29.04.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.04.2006 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 35
16.06.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.05.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
25.05.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.05.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
25.05.2005 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
11.02.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.02.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
11.02.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
26.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
29.06.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.06.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
19.02.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.2002 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
05.12.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
05.12.2002 Description Search / examination 10
22.10.2002 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.12.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
13.11.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.09.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.09.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
19.09.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.09.2001 European search report Search / examination 2
21.08.2001 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
30.04.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 21
30.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 16
27.04.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.04.2001 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.04.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
17.04.2001 Description Search / examination 19
17.04.2001 Drawings Search / examination 3
17.04.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7