blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1152199


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.07.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.08.2010  [2010/32]
25.06.2010 Opposition rejected published on  28.07.2010  [2010/30]
17.06.2010 Deletion: Despatch of communication that application is refused
17.06.2010 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
02.03.2010 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.03.2010 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
24.06.2009 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2009  [2009/02]
08.08.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2008  [2008/37]
20.06.2008 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
03.08.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2007  [2007/36]
08.06.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2007  [2007/28]
12.01.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2007  [2007/07]
30.11.2006 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.11.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2006  [2006/51]
26.09.2006 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
30.05.2006 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
26.05.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2006  [2006/26]
19.05.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.06.2006  [2006/25]
05.05.2006 Opposition filed published on  07.06.2006  [2006/23]
24.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.04.2006  [2006/15]
17.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
10.06.2005 (Expected) grant published on  27.07.2005  [2005/30]
08.06.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.06.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.05.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.02.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.08.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.06.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.02.2004 First examination report
14.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.05.2003 Renewal fee
11.12.2002 Amendment by applicant
09.10.2002 Change - extension states
07.06.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  24.07.2002  [2002/30]
01.02.2002 Request for examination filed published on  20.03.2002  [2002/12]
21.09.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.11.2001 [2001/45]