blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1152199
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE20007909U 20.07.2000U1
Priority number Date
DE20007909 03.05.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE50106854D 01.09.2005D1
Priority number Date
DE20018873 03.11.2000
DE20007909 03.05.2000
DE50106854 17.04.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1152199Global Dossier 27.07.2005B1
EP1152199 07.11.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE20018873 03.11.2000
DE20007909 03.05.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT300713T 15.08.2005T
Priority number Date
DE20018873 03.11.2000
DE20007909 03.05.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE20018873U 08.02.2001U1
Priority number Date
DE20018873 03.11.2000
DE20007909 03.05.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2244515T 16.12.2005T3
Priority number Date
DE20018873 03.11.2000
DE20007909 03.05.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6519948 18.02.2003B2
US2002026798 07.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
DE20018873 03.11.2000
DE20007909 03.05.2000