Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1152199

EP1152199 - Thermal container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  25.06.2010
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 11.08.2010  [2010/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPV Inheidener Produktions- und Vertriebsgesellschaft mbH
Ezetilstrasse 1
35410 Hungen-Inheiden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/45]For all designated states
IPV Inheidener Produktions- und Vertriebsgesellschaft mbH
Ezetilstrasse
35410 Hungen-Inheiden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zorn, Manfred
EZetilstrasse
35410 Hungen-Inheiden / DE
 [2001/45]
Representative(s)Heim, Hans-Karl , et al
Weber & Heim
Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/45]Heim, Hans-Karl, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date01109525.417.04.2001
[2001/45]
Priority number, dateDE2000207909U03.05.2000         Original published format: DE 20007909 U
DE2000218873U03.11.2000         Original published format: DE 20018873 U
[2001/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1152199
Date:07.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1152199
Date:27.07.2005
Language:DE
[2005/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:F25D11/00, F25B21/02, A45C5/14, B62B1/12, A45C11/20, F25D23/06, B65D85/68
[2001/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/30]
Former [2001/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Thermobehälter[2001/45]
English:Thermal container[2001/45]
French:Conteneur thermique[2001/45]
Examination procedure03.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/12]
05.12.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2005Fee for grant paid
25.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.04.2006  08.05.2006  ADMISSIBLE
WAECO International GmbH
Industriebegiet Süd Hollefeldstrasse 63
48282 Emsdetten / DE
Opponent's representative
Schumacher, Horst
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43 A
45133 Essen / DE
 [2008/30]
Former [2006/23]
Opponent(s)01  27.04.2006   
WAECO International GmbH
Industriebegiet Süd Hollefeldstrasse 63
48282 Emsdetten / DE
Opponent's representative
Schumacher, Horst
Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
01.06.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.11.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.03.2010Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
14.03.2010Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY27.07.2005
FI27.07.2005
IE27.07.2005
IT27.07.2005
TR27.07.2005
DK27.10.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
LU17.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
ES18.04.2009
[2010/32]
Former [2009/02]CY27.07.2005
FI27.07.2005
IE27.07.2005
IT27.07.2005
TR27.07.2005
DK27.10.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
LU17.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
Former [2008/37]FI27.07.2005
IE27.07.2005
IT27.07.2005
TR27.07.2005
DK27.10.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
LU17.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
Former [2007/36]FI27.07.2005
IE27.07.2005
IT27.07.2005
TR27.07.2005
DK27.10.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
BE30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
Former [2007/28]FI27.07.2005
IE27.07.2005
TR27.07.2005
DK27.10.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
BE30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
Former [2007/07]FI27.07.2005
IE27.07.2005
TR27.07.2005
DK27.10.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
MC30.04.2006
Former [2006/51]FI27.07.2005
IE27.07.2005
TR27.07.2005
DK27.10.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
Former [2006/26]FI27.07.2005
IE27.07.2005
DK27.10.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
Former [2006/25]FI27.07.2005
IE27.07.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
Former [2006/14]FI27.07.2005
GR27.10.2005
SE27.10.2005
PT27.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI27.07.2005
SE27.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5865032  (MACPHERSON EDWARD TAYLOR [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,6-15;
 [Y]US5249438  (RHANEY MICHAEL A [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5472279  (LIN CHEN-HSIUNG [TW]) [Y] 6,7,14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5501076  (SHARP III CHARLES A [US], et al) [Y] 8,9,15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9607063  (PAECHTER BARBARA [DE]) [Y] 10 * the whole document *;
 [YA]EP0085534  (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [Y] 11 * the whole document * [A] 12;
 [Y]GB2155168  (MAYFLOWER PRODUCTS LIMITED) [Y] 12 * the whole document *;
 [YA]US5301508  (KAHL W HENRY [US], et al) [Y] 13 * the whole document * [A] 8,9;
 [A]DE9012414U  (DUDEK, GÜNTER) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE29614114U  (PAECHTER BARBARA [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19728539