Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1182106

EP1182106 - Travel detector for empty/load brake control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation
1001 Air Brake Avenue
Wilmerding, PA 15148 / US
[2002/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Scott, Daniel D.
7540 Ardmore Street
Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15218 / US
02 / Krampitz, Mark S.
100 Edith Drive
Hunker, Pennsylvania 15639 / US
 [2002/09]
Representative(s)Petri, Stellan , et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]Petri, Stellan , et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 41 88
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date01109832.423.04.2001
[2002/09]
Priority number, dateUS2000063503804.08.2000         Original published format: US 635038
[2002/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1182106
Date:27.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1182106
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1182106
Date:02.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/18
[2002/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/21]
Former [2002/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wegaufnehmer für Bremsregelsystem für variable beladungen[2002/09]
English:Travel detector for empty/load brake control[2002/09]
French:Capteur de déplacement pour système de freinage dépendant de la charge[2002/09]
Examination procedure02.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
24.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2003Fee for grant paid
24.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR02.01.2004
IT02.01.2004
DE03.04.2004
[2007/36]
Former [2006/14]FR02.01.2004
DE03.04.2004
Former [2005/12]DE03.04.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4417767  (BILLETER HENRY R [US]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE3109020  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]US4801179  (HINTNER JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2099528  (LUCAS IND PLC) [A] 1 * abstract *