blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1150200

EP1150200 - Print control apparatus, and storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2012
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2012New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
07.12.2012Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.01.2013  [2013/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2 Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawamoro, Hirokazu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Iida, Mitsunori, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2001/44]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/44]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01109934.824.04.2001
[2001/44]
Priority number, dateJP2000012775127.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000127751
JP2000013128628.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000131286
[2001/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1150200
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1150200
Date:29.03.2006
[2006/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2006
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/12
[2001/44]
CPC:
G06F3/1204 (EP,US); G06F3/1205 (EP,US); G06F3/125 (EP,US);
G06F3/1267 (EP,US); G06F3/1274 (EP,US); G06F3/1285 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/49]
Former [2001/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Drucksteuergerät und Speichermedium[2001/44]
English:Print control apparatus, and storage medium[2001/44]
French:Dispositif de commande d'impression et médium de stockage[2001/44]
Examination procedure29.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/46]
25.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/02]
06.12.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.01.2013
15.01.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.08.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
16.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0851367  (IBM [US]) [X] 43-66* the whole document *;
 [X]EP0895182  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 7,8,11,12,16,17,25,26,34,35 * figures 2-8 * * column 9, line 16 - column 16, line 27 *;
 [A]EP0902391  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * figures 8-10,14 * * column 8, line 11 - line 29 * * column 10, line 8 - line 26 *;
 [XA]EP0971288  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 5,6 * * column 11, line 5 - column 14, line 16 * [A] 25,26,34,35
ExaminationJPH10322487
by applicantJPH10322487
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.